NY A08845 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to defining cultural competency training for real estate brokers.
Title
Relates to defining cultural competency training for real estate brokers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7770 |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.374 |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07770 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.100