NY A08832 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in work zones by means of photo devices.
Title
Establishes a demonstration program implementing speed violation monitoring systems in work zones by means of photo devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | print number 8832a |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05223 (Same As) 2020-07-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5223B