NY A08822 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s6525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s6525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes Stewart International Airport in the definition of covered airport location for the purposes of minimum wage rates.
Title
Includes Stewart International Airport in the definition of covered airport location for the purposes of minimum wage rates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6525 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.212 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.212 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06525 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.106