NY A08821 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence; and repeals such commission one year after this act takes effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a temporary state commission to study and investigate how to regulate artificial intelligence; and repeals such commission one year after this act takes effect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.243
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.243
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2017-12-06Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08821&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08821&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08821
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08821&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08821&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08821&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08821&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback