NY A08817 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 8817a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - print number 8817a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing the volunteer firefighters' and ambulance workers' credit; increases the amount of the credit from $200 to $500 for single filers and from $400 to $1,000 for spouses filing jointly.
Title
Relates to increasing the volunteer firefighters' and ambulance workers' credit; increases the amount of the credit from $200 to $500 for single filers and from $400 to $1,000 for spouses filing jointly.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | print number 8817a |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06802 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE