NY A08815 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows family and criminal courts to extend orders of protection for up to two years beyond the expiration date of an issued order of protection if the court finds reason for an extension and places such reasoning on the record.
Title
Allows family and criminal courts to extend orders of protection for up to two years beyond the expiration date of an issued order of protection if the court finds reason for an extension and places such reasoning on the record.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Philip Palmesano [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] | Asm. William Barclay [R] |
Asm. Andrew Goodell [R] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] | Asm. Brian Kolb [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-11-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07653 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY