NY A08811 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the HTLV-1 and HTLV-2 viruses to the public health department's health care and wellness education and outreach program.
Title
Includes the HTLV-1 and HTLV-2 viruses to the public health department's health care and wellness education and outreach program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | print number 8811a |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-11-29 | Assembly | referred to health |