NY A08781 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from prohibiting pharmacies from disclosing to consumers the cost of prescription medication, the availability of alternative medications or alternative means of purchasing prescription medications; and prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from collecting copayments from consumers of prescription medications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from prohibiting pharmacies from disclosing to consumers the cost of prescription medication, the availability of alternative medications or alternative means of purchasing prescription medications; and prohibits pharmacy benefit managers from collecting copayments from consumers of prescription medications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-03-06Senate3RD READING CAL.376
2018-03-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6940
2018-02-05SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-02-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-02-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-02-01Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.628
2018-01-29Assemblyreported
2018-01-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2017-11-27Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06940 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8781

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08781&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08781&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08781
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08781&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08781&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08781&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8781#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback