NY A08775 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7174a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s7174a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates certain lakes as inland waterways.
Title
Designates certain lakes as inland waterways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7174a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.319 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | print number 8775b |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | print number 8775a |
2018-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2017-11-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07174 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.485