NY A08757 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - print number 8757a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - print number 8757a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements for licensure of mental health practitioners and providing mental health practitioners authority to give diagnosis.
Title
Relates to requirements for licensure of mental health practitioners and providing mental health practitioners authority to give diagnosis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | print number 8757a |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-11-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06582 (Same As) 2018-04-20 - PRINT NUMBER 6582A