NY A08753 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6828
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6828
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of Bay Shore, county of Suffolk, as the "Corey J. Swinson Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the hamlet of Bay Shore, county of Suffolk, as the "Corey J. Swinson Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s6828 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.171 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06828 (Same As) 2014-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.195