NY A08750 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a credit for customers of certain private water utilities and requires a feasibility study relating to the Jericho Water District; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Title
Establishes a credit for customers of certain private water utilities and requires a feasibility study relating to the Jericho Water District; and provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | print number 8750a |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-10-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06863 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - referred to ways and means