NY A08736 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the taxation of state owned land for all purposes, exclusive of improvements and in accordance with any payment in lieu of taxes agreement commencing on and after January first, two thousand twenty-one.
Title
Provides for the taxation of state owned land for all purposes, exclusive of improvements and in accordance with any payment in lieu of taxes agreement commencing on and after January first, two thousand twenty-one.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07216 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT