NY A08735 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - substituted by s7760
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-01 - substituted by s7760
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of criminal justice services to publish quarterly reports providing information related to firearms, rifles and shotguns used in the commission of crimes in the state of New York.
Title
Requires the division of criminal justice services to publish quarterly reports providing information related to firearms, rifles and shotguns used in the commission of crimes in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | substituted by s7760 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.23 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.23 |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S07760 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.96