NY A08714 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - signed chap.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - signed chap.29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the hiring of security guards by public sports venues with a capacity of at least sixty thousand people located in the county of Erie.
Title
Relates to the hiring of security guards by public sports venues with a capacity of at least sixty thousand people located in the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Assembly | signed chap.29 |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-02-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.191 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7832 |
2022-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.308 |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07832 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8714