NY A08705 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring a notice promulgated by the attorney general to be posted on all automated teller machines regarding skimming.
Title
Relates to requiring a notice promulgated by the attorney general to be posted on all automated teller machines regarding skimming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.168 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.168 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | print number 8705a |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2017-10-05 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S06845 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES