NY A08703 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-7)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - substituted by s6144b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - substituted by s6144b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to filling vacancies on a board of visitors for state veterans' homes through interim appointments if such vacancy has not been filled within 270 days.
Title
Relates to filling vacancies on a board of visitors for state veterans' homes through interim appointments if such vacancy has not been filled within 270 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Assembly | substituted by s6144b |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8703a |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.611 |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-10-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06144 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - VETOED MEMO.264