NY A08703 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - signed chap.265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Battenkill river as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Title
Designates the Battenkill river as an inland waterway for the purposes of waterfront revitalization.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Senate | signed chap.265 |
2014-08-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.857 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6333 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.827 |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06333 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8703