NY A08690 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing handicap parking permits in the form of both placards and window stickers.
Title
Relates to providing handicap parking permits in the form of both placards and window stickers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08332 (Same As) 2018-05-01 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION