NY A08688 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale and distribution of flavored e-liquid which creates a distinguishable flavor or aroma for use in e-cigarettes.
Title
Prohibits the sale and distribution of flavored e-liquid which creates a distinguishable flavor or aroma for use in e-cigarettes.
Sponsors
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08610 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES