NY A08672 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-11)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - print number 8672a
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain crimes relating to the disposal, possession and acceptance of solid waste and hazardous materials, including the crimes of criminal disposal, scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste, criminal possession of solid waste, criminal acceptance of solid waste or construction and demolition material, and criminal acceptance of solid waste containing a hazardous and acutely hazardous substance; establishes crimes relating to sand mining including scheme to defraud by sand mining, criminal sand mining and criminal disposal incident to sand mining.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain crimes relating to the disposal, possession and acceptance of solid waste and hazardous materials, including the crimes of criminal disposal, scheme to defraud by disposal of solid waste, criminal possession of solid waste, criminal acceptance of solid waste or construction and demolition material, and criminal acceptance of solid waste containing a hazardous and acutely hazardous substance; establishes crimes relating to sand mining including scheme to defraud by sand mining, criminal sand mining and criminal disposal incident to sand mining.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08Assemblyprint number 8672a
2020-07-08Assemblyamend and recommit to environmental conservation
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2019-10-23Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S06758 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10803A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback