NY A08672 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s6886d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - substituted by s6886d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for the placement, removal, or temporary lift of a security freeze following consumer credit reporting agency date breaches.
Title
Relates to prohibiting consumer credit reporting agencies from charging a fee for the placement, removal, or temporary lift of a security freeze following consumer credit reporting agency date breaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s6886d |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 8672b |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-30 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.917 |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | print number 8672a |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06886 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.480