NY A08652 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - print number 8652a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - print number 8652a
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to fees for gift cards; limits the amount a merchant may charge for the gift card; and prohibits the expiration of such gift cards.
Title
Relates to fees for gift cards; limits the amount a merchant may charge for the gift card; and prohibits the expiration of such gift cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | print number 8652a |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-10-02 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05771 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES