NY A08648 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - print number 8648a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - print number 8648a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of misappropriation of payroll funds when a person knows that funds are designated for use as employee payroll funds or as payment of payroll taxes, and intentionally prevents the funds from being used for their designated purpose.
Title
Establishes the crime of misappropriation of payroll funds when a person knows that funds are designated for use as employee payroll funds or as payment of payroll taxes, and intentionally prevents the funds from being used for their designated purpose.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | print number 8648a |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-10-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06725 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - referred to codes