NY A08636 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the public service commission shall require that all customers of electric and natural gas corporations shall have the opportunity to purchase electricity and natural gas from any supplier.
Title
Provides that the public service commission shall require that all customers of electric and natural gas corporations shall have the opportunity to purchase electricity and natural gas from any supplier.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06399 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES