NY A08630 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - approval memo.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - approval memo.64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits cosmetic products and personal care products that contain mercury.
Title
Prohibits cosmetic products and personal care products that contain mercury.
Sponsors
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Asm. Phara Souffrant Forrest [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | approval memo.64 |
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.754 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1858 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8291A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.550 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 8630a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08291 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8630A