NY A08625 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - print number 8625a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - print number 8625a
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to farm worker meal and lodging minimum wage credits.
Title
Relates to farm worker meal and lodging minimum wage credits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Assembly | print number 8625a |
2018-03-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06907 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - PRINT NUMBER 6907A