NY A08620 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a licensee with a license to sell wine at retail for consumption on the premises to include the sale of shochu on such premises to be consumed under the same terms and conditions.
Title
Authorizes a licensee with a license to sell wine at retail for consumption on the premises to include the sale of shochu on such premises to be consumed under the same terms and conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.255 |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.926 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7913 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.441 |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07913 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8620