NY A08620 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the employment of persons to function as central service technicians in certain healthcare facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the employment of persons to function as central service technicians in certain healthcare facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.157
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.534
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5155D
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.297
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.297
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-12Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8620c
2012-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-05Assemblyprint number 8620b
2012-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2012-05-01Assemblyreference changed to health
2012-02-21Assemblyprint number 8620a
2012-02-21Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to higher education
2011-09-21Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S05155 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8620C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08620&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08620&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08620
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08620&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08620A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08620&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08620B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08620&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08620C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08620&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A8620#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback