NY A08619 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for victims and survivors of crime to access victim compensation funds by removing the mandatory law enforcement reporting requirement and providing alternative forms of evidence that would show that a qualifying crime was committed.
Title
Expands eligibility for victims and survivors of crime to access victim compensation funds by removing the mandatory law enforcement reporting requirement and providing alternative forms of evidence that would show that a qualifying crime was committed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.614 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.614 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | print number 8619b |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | print number 8619a |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07573 (Same As) 2022-05-26 - PRINT NUMBER 7573A