NY A08614 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.460
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of an artist and theatrical employment agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of an artist and theatrical employment agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.460
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.72
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5576B
2012-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.160
2012-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.160
2012-06-13Assemblyreported
2012-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-06Assemblyprint number 8614b
2012-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2012-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-05-31Assemblyprint number 8614a
2012-05-31Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to labor
2011-09-21Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S05576 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8614B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08614&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08614&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08614
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08614&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08614A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08614&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08614B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08614&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A8614#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback