NY A08613 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions authorizing the city of Hudson to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Title
Extends provisions authorizing the city of Hudson to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 121 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.404 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.952 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7538 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.553 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07538 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8613