NY A08606 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8023a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8023a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Carle Place Water District.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Carle Place Water District.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s8023a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.413 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | print number 8606a |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08023 (Same As) 2022-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.630