NY A08605 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to unlawful use of a model aircraft; prohibits use of model aircraft in restricted areas, out of the user's line of sight, near stadiums or above 400 feet.
Title
Relates to unlawful use of a model aircraft; prohibits use of model aircraft in restricted areas, out of the user's line of sight, near stadiums or above 400 feet.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Marc Butler [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-12-23 | Assembly | print number 8605a |
2015-12-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2015-12-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |