NY A08591 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - print number 8591a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - print number 8591a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the estate tax.
Title
Repeals the estate tax.
Sponsors
Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Assembly | print number 8591a |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02884 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - PRINT NUMBER 2884A