NY A08559 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - signed chap.83
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of environmental conservation to establish a Long Island deer management pilot program in the town of Southold.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of environmental conservation to establish a Long Island deer management pilot program in the town of Southold.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13Assemblysigned chap.83
2024-02-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-02-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-02-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-02-12Senate3RD READING CAL.190
2024-02-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8052
2024-02-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2024-02-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-02-05Assemblypassed assembly
2024-02-01Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.294
2024-01-30Assemblyreported
2024-01-09Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S08052 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8559

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback