NY A08559 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-8)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - amended on third reading 8559b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-01 - amended on third reading 8559b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing notice to a homeowner whose property is being foreclosed that they do not have to abandon the property until the day of the foreclosure sale.
Title
Relates to providing notice to a homeowner whose property is being foreclosed that they do not have to abandon the property until the day of the foreclosure sale.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8559b |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.797 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | print number 8559a |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2015-10-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06656 (Same As) 2016-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6656A