NY A08556 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - held for consideration in codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the category of "qualified group practice" for medical, dental and podiatric practices that comply with certain standards and authorizes such practices to operate a malpractice prevention program.
Title
Establishes the category of "qualified group practice" for medical, dental and podiatric practices that comply with certain standards and authorizes such practices to operate a malpractice prevention program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in codes |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-10-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06080 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES