NY A08538 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - print number 8538a
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - print number 8538a
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits wagers on a horse racing event unless such racing event is offered pursuant to a fixed odds sports wagering agreement; authorizes agreements between a mobile sports wagering operator and an affiliate to locate self-service sports betting kiosks upon the premises of the affiliate.
Title
Prohibits wagers on a horse racing event unless such racing event is offered pursuant to a fixed odds sports wagering agreement; authorizes agreements between a mobile sports wagering operator and an affiliate to locate self-service sports betting kiosks upon the premises of the affiliate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | print number 8538a |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S07536 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE