NY A08533 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-5)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a drug assistance demonstration program and authorizes emergency prescriptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a drug assistance demonstration program and authorizes emergency prescriptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-07-23Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-07-23Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-23Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.314
2020-07-23Assemblysubstituted for a8533b
2020-07-21Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-07-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-06-10SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6492B
2020-03-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-03-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-03-03Senate1ST REPORT CAL.555
2020-01-28SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 6492A
2020-01-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2020-01-08Senatereturned to senate
2020-01-08Senatedied in assembly
2019-06-19Senatereferred to health
2019-06-18AssemblyDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18AssemblyPASSED SENATE
2019-06-18AssemblyORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1642
2019-06-13AssemblyREFERRED TO RULES
2020-07-23Assemblysubstituted by s6492b
2020-07-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.314
2020-07-22Assemblyrules report cal.314
2020-07-22Assemblyreported
2020-07-22Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-07-01Assemblyprint number 8533b
2020-07-01Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2020-02-10Assemblyprint number 8533a
2020-02-10Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to health
2019-08-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06492 (Same As) 2020-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8533
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08533&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08533
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08533&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08533A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08533&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08533B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08533&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08533&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08533&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8533#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8533#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8533#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8533#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A8533#SF2

Bill Comments 750

feedback