NY A08528 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-29 - substituted by s8050
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies information which is required to be contained in the notice to customers warning of possible electronic benefits transfer scams, including skimming; directs the office of temporary disability and assistance to create a model sign to comply with such notice provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies information which is required to be contained in the notice to customers warning of possible electronic benefits transfer scams, including skimming; directs the office of temporary disability and assistance to create a model sign to comply with such notice provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-29Assemblysubstituted by s8050
2024-01-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.280
2024-01-23Assemblyreported
2024-01-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2024-01-05Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S08050 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - SIGNED CHAP.70

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback