NY A08528 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-12)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8033a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8033a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "diaper initiative affordability for parents and elderly remedy (DIAPER) act".
Title
Establishes the "diaper initiative affordability for parents and elderly remedy (DIAPER) act".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8033a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.700 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | print number 8528a |
2022-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08033 (Same As) 2022-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.386