NY A08526 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - print number 8526b
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - print number 8526b
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring dogs, cats and rabbits sold by certain pet dealers to be rescue animals, or animals sourced from licensed breeders.
Title
Relates to requiring dogs, cats and rabbits sold by certain pet dealers to be rescue animals, or animals sourced from licensed breeders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Assembly | print number 8526b |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | print number 8526a |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S08105 (Same As) 2018-03-29 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION