NY A08514 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - approval memo.37
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reciprocity of debarments imposed under the federal Davis-Bacon Act and directs the governor to convene a work group to study and make recommendations to the legislature regarding the appropriate payment of supplements to construction workers; prohibits companies who violate the Davis-Bacon act from contracting with the state.
Title
Relates to reciprocity of debarments imposed under the federal Davis-Bacon Act and directs the governor to convene a work group to study and make recommendations to the legislature regarding the appropriate payment of supplements to construction workers; prohibits companies who violate the Davis-Bacon act from contracting with the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | approval memo.37 |
2017-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.461 |
2017-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2197 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6790 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.636 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.636 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06790 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8514