NY A08513 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-05 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to interim multiple dwellings.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to interim multiple dwellings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | recommitted to housing |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-05 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2018-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.606 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.583 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.583 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-18 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06812 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT