NY A08510 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-13 - substituted by s8017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the effectiveness of a chapter of 2023 relating to allowing for non-CPA ownership of firms; provides that such act shall take effect in 6 months.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the effectiveness of a chapter of 2023 relating to allowing for non-CPA ownership of firms; provides that such act shall take effect in 6 months.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-13Assemblysubstituted by s8017
2024-02-08Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.300
2024-02-06Assemblyreported
2024-01-04Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S08017 (Same As) 2024-03-01 - SIGNED CHAP.96

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback