NY A08509 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s5633a
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - substituted by s5633a
Summary
Authorizes the deferral of up to five vacation days per year for state correctional officers and security hospital treatment assistants and the receipt of a lump sum payment equal to the value of the time deferred upon retirement.
Title
Authorizes the deferral of up to five vacation days per year for state correctional officers and security hospital treatment assistants and the receipt of a lump sum payment equal to the value of the time deferred upon retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | substituted by s5633a | |
2010-07-01 | rules report cal.574 | |
2010-07-01 | reported | |
2010-07-01 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-02-23 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-28 | print number 8509a | |
2010-01-28 | amend and recommit to governmental employees | |
2010-01-12 | committed to governmental employees | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.598 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-18 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-18 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-18 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-18 | ordered to third reading rules cal.512 | |
2009-06-18 | rules report cal.512 | |
2009-06-18 | reported | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-26 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S5633-A (Same As) 2010-07-30 - VETOED MEMO.6726
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08509&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |