NY A08503 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an intensive addiction and medical services integrated services pilot program to support two three-year demonstration programs that provide intensive addiction and medical services integrated services to individuals who have significant addiction and medical issues.
Title
Establishes an intensive addiction and medical services integrated services pilot program to support two three-year demonstration programs that provide intensive addiction and medical services integrated services to individuals who have significant addiction and medical issues.
Sponsors
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Matthew Simpson [R] |
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Mary Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | print number 8503a |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2021-12-03 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S07650 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to ways and means