NY A08494 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that construction and fabrication done off of a public work site for specific use only in a public work project be compensated at the prevailing wage rate.
Title
Ensures that construction and fabrication done off of a public work site for specific use only in a public work project be compensated at the prevailing wage rate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | print number 8494a |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2021-11-17 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S08963 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE