NY A08488 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Village of Mannsville to hire a village clerk who is not a resident of such village.
Title
Authorizes the Village of Mannsville to hire a village clerk who is not a resident of such village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.226 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2190 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6752 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.580 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.580 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06752 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8488